THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/10/2018 5:30:44 AM

Addison, Kirsten Mya Lynn (CPSO#: 80845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Family Health Team
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1212
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Addison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Addison ( CPSO# 80845 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 628-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN MYA LYNN ADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006