THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 4:22:38 AM

Phillips, Stephanie Elaine (CPSO#: 81270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Queenston Street, Suite 204
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 641-5700
Fax: (905) 641-0074
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Phillips ( CPSO# 81270 )

Business Address:
145 Queenston Street
Suite 204
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 641-5700

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ELAINE PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009