THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/08/2018 9:32:42 PM

Abdurahman, Adel Abduselam (CPSO#: 81430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 Mcconnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 613 9384240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 queensway West
Toronto ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905 8979228
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adel Abdurahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 4, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Adel Abduselam
            Abdurahman, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Abdurahman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ADEL ABDUSELAM ABDURAHMAN
                                          ("Dr. Abdurahman")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, certificate of registration number 81430, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matter of College File Number 7215773,
                  allegations that I engaged in professional misconduct, namely: an act or
                  omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all
                  the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as
                  disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

            (4)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, have read the Notice of Hearing dated May 19, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, undertake that  I shall be physically available in a
                  timely manner at all times when I am providing on-call coverage.

            (9)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, undertake that I shall be on-call at only one location
                  at any given time.

            (10)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (11)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any
                  other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that if the Discipline Committee has directed
                  the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Abdurahman is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations that he engaged in professional
                              misconduct. As a result of the referral:
                  
                                    Dr. Abdurahman shall be physically available in a
                                    timely manner at all times when he is providing on-call
                                    coverage.  
                  
                                    Dr. Abdurahman shall be on-call at only one location at
                                    any given time.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            (21)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Abdurahman, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Abdurahman is a general surgeon practising medicine in Sault Ste Marie, Ontario. He received his 
medical degree in Ontario in 2004 and his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice 
and specialist qualification in general surgery in Ontario in 2009. 
 
Alternative Payment Plan (“the Agreement”) 
 
Effective in 2005, the Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care entered into an Alternative Payment 
Plan (“the Agreement”) with physicians, local hospitals and the Ontario Medical Association for 
funding of general surgery services in the district of Kenora and Rainy River. One of the goals of the 
Agreement is to provide surgical services in the under-serviced regions of northern Ontario. The 
physicians are members in a group known as the Regional Surgical Network, (“the Group”) and are 
required to sign a declaration and consent confirming that they are bound by the Agreement. Under the 
terms of the Agreement, a physician member of the Group receives an annual payment in return for 
providing surgical services in one of the hospitals named in the Agreement. The Agreement 
specifically prohibits physicians who are members of the Group from submitting claims or accepting 
payment from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”).   
 
Disgraceful, Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct 
 
In September 2014, Dr. Abdurahman was appointed as one of two General Surgeons to Riverside 
Health Care Facilities, La Verendrye Hospital, in Fort Frances, Ontario (Fort Frances Hospital), with 
courtesy privileges at the Emo and Rainy River Health Centres – the hospitals covered by the 
Agreement. On January 1, 2015, Dr. Abdurahman signed declaration and consent forms, confirming 
that he is a member of the Group and is bound by the terms of the Agreement. Between January 1, 
2015 and October 6, 2016, Dr. Abdurahman was providing general surgery services at Fort Frances 
Hospital under the terms the Agreement, pursuant to which he received lump sum payment in 
exchange for providing general surgery services and was specifically prohibited from submitting 
claims or accepting payment from the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”).  
 
During the time he held privileges with Fort Frances Hospital, Dr. Abdurahman held privileges at five 
other hospitals in Ontario, which are outside the service area covered by the Agreement and are 
located within 950-2000km from Fort Frances Hospital.  
 
In October 2016, the College received information from Fort Frances Hospital that Dr. Abdurahman 
had breached the terms of the Agreement by: 
 
 - practising outside the geographic area covered by the Agreement; 
 - billing OHIP for services provided, contrary to the terms of the Agreement, on a fee-for –service 
  basis; and 
 - providing locum coverage and services at hospitals up to 2000 km away from Fort Frances Hospital 
  at the same time that he was paid to be first General Surgeon on-call at the Fort Frances Hospital. 
Specifically, during the period that he was bound by the Agreement, Dr. Abdurahman: 
 
-  submitted claims for services provided and accepted payment from OHIP in the amount of $204, 
   959.74, in violation of the agreement;  
-  rendered and billed for services at hospitals that are not parties to the agreement and are between 
   1000 to 2000 km away from Fort Frances on thirty-three (33) dates. On at least thirty (30) of these 
   dates, he was also first General Surgeon on-call at Fort Frances Hospital and it was physically 
   impossible for him to attend at Fort Frances Hospital within any reasonable time period; 
-  on the same dates when he was being paid to be on-call at Fort Frances Hospital, he submitted 
   claims and received payment from OHIP in the amount of $37, 827.34 for services rendered at 
   other hospitals, an amount included in the total amount of $204, 959.74, referred to above; 
-  used vacation days from Fort Frances to provide fee-for-service coverage, and submit claims to 
   OHIP, at hospitals in Ontario not party to the agreement;   
-  upon learning that Fort Frances Hospital had received information that he was providing services 
   and billing OHIP outside the terms of the agreement, Dr. Abdurahman provided inaccurate 
   information to Fort Frances Hospital regarding the number of dates he was providing services at 
   other hospitals. He also contacted the Chief of Staff of Fort Frances Hospital to ask him to 
   retroactively falsify the Fort Frances Hospital on-call schedule so that the schedule would not 
   reflect conflicts when Dr. Abdurahman was in fact providing services elsewhere.  
    
Resignation and Repayment Plan 
 
Dr. Abdurahman resigned his privileges with Riverside Health Care on October 6, 2016, and is no 
longer a member of the Group. Dr. Abdurahman entered into a promissory note, dated October 27, 
2016, in the amount of $46,944.87, payable to the Group in four instalments. The promissory note 
reflects  money  the  Group  owes  to  the Ministry  of  Health  and  Long-Term  Care as  a  result  of  Dr. 
Abdurahman’s breach of the Agreement. The amount of $46,944.87 is comprised of the amount paid 
to Dr. Abdurahman for being the first General Surgeon on-call at Fort Frances on dates when he was 
also billing OHIP for services rendered in other hospitals, as well as a recruitment bonus he was paid 
to work in Fort Frances and to which he was no longer entitled due to his breach of the Agreement.  
 
Under the terms of the promissory note, Dr. Abdurahman was scheduled to pay the entire amount by 
March 17, 2017. To date, Dr. Abdurahman has repaid $6,000.00. 
 
Disposition 
 
On August 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Abdurahman’s Certificate of Registration for a nine (9) month 
      period, effective immediately. 
   -  Dr. Abdurahman appear before the panel to be reprimanded within three (3) months of the date 
      this Order becomes final. 
   -  The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abdurahman’s 
      Certificate of Registration, effective immediately: 
      
-  Dr. Abdurahman will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and 
   professionalism, at his own expense, within 6 months of the date of this Order, or any 
   alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. Dr. 
   Abdurahman will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program and 
   provide proof of completion to the College; 
-  Prior to resuming practice after the period of suspension of his certificate of 
   registration. Dr. Abdurahman shall retain a College-approved clinical supervisor, who 
   will sign an undertaking in the form attached as Schedule "A" to the Order (the 
   "Clinical Supervisor"), to review Dr. Abdurahman's Ontario Health Insurance 
   Plan(OHIP) claims and billings, any other billing submitted to or paid out by the 
   Ministry of Health and Long-Term Care (MOHLTC) and the corresponding patient 
   records; 
-  For a period of five (5)years, Dr. Abdurahman may practice only under the 
   supervision of the Clinical Supervisor and will abide by all recommendations of his 
   Clinical Supervisor with respect to his practice, including but not limited to review of 
   OHIP billings and corresponding patient charts, and may also include practice 
   management, and continuing education. The period of Clinical Supervision will 
   commence on the expiry of the period of suspension, or on the date that the Clinical 
   Supervisor is approved, if one is not approved during the period of suspension; 
-  The Clinical Supervisor will conduct the review once every month and the review will 
   consist of at least twenty (20) patient charts, selected in the sole discretion of the 
   Clinical Supervisor, and the corresponding claims and billings submitted to OHIP 
   and/or the MOHLTC; 
-  The Clinical Supervisor will provide a report to the College once every month, or 
   more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Abdurahman's 
   standard of practice or conduct. 
-  If, prior to completion of Clinical Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor is unable or 
   unwilling to continue in that role for any reason. Dr. Abdurahman shall retain a new 
   College-approved Clinical Supervisor who will sign an undertaking in the form 
   attached hereto as Schedule "A". If Dr. Abdurahman fails to retain a Clinical 
   Supervisor on the terms set out above within thirty (30) days of receiving notification 
   that his former Clinical Supervisor is unable or unwilling to continue in that role, he 
   shall cease practicing medicine until such time as he has obtained a Clinical 
   Supervisor acceptable to the College. If Dr. Abdurahman is required to cease practice 
   as a result of this paragraph, this will constitute a term, condition and limitation on his 
   certificate of registration and such term, condition and limitation shall be included on 
   the public register; 
-  After a minimum period of one year of Clinical Supervision, and only upon receipt of 
   approval from the College, the frequency of supervision may be reduced from time to 
   time thereafter as recommended by the Clinical Supervisor and only as approved by 
   the College; 
-  Upon completion of the five (5) year period of Clinical Supervision, as described 
   above, within approximately six (6) months. Dr. Abdurahman shall undergo a re-
   assessment of his practice by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor"). This re-
   assessment by the Assessor will include a review of Dr. Abdurahman's office charts 
   and corresponding OHIP billings and an interview with Dr. Abdurahman. Dr. 
          Abdurahman shall abide by all recommendations made by the College-appointed 
          Assessor. The Assessor shall report the results of this re-assessment to the College; 
       -  Dr. Abdurahman shall inform the College of each and every location where he 
          practises, in any jurisdiction (his "Practice Location(s)") within fifteen (15) days of 
          this Order and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 
          fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location; 
       -  Dr. Abdurahman shall consent to the sharing of information between the Clinical 
          Supervisor, Assessor and the College as any of them deem necessary or desirable in 
          order to fulfill their respective obligations; 
       -  Dr. Abdurahman shall consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings and cooperate 
          with inspections of his practice and patient charts by the Clinical Supervisor and 
          College representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
          with this term of the Order. Monitoring this term shall include making enquiries of the 
          Ministry of Health and Long- Term Care regarding Dr. Abdurahman's billings; 
       -  Dr. Abdurahman shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office practice 
          and patient charts by the College for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
          compliance with the terms of this Order and shall provide his irrevocable consent to 
          the College to make appropriate enquiries of any person or institution who may have 
          relevant information for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with 
          the terms of this Order; and 
       -  Dr. Abdurahman shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
          implementing the terms of this Order. 
   
-  Dr. Abdurahman shall, within three (3) months, pay a fine to the Minister of Finance in the 
   amount  of  $35,000.00,  and  Dr.  Abdurahman  shall  provide  proof  of  this  payment  to  the 
   Registrar of the College. 
-  Dr. Abdurahman pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
   thirty (30) days from the date this Order becomes final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 9, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Adel Abduselam Abdurahman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 4, 2017:

Dr. Abdurahman is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the referral:

• Dr. Abdurahman shall be physically available in a timely manner at all times when he is providing on-call coverage.
• Dr. Abdurahman shall be on-call at only one location at any given time.