THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 13/12/2018 10:09:09 AM

Al-Harbi, Ibrahim Hameed Mohaisen (CPSO#: 81755)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2010