THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 16/07/2018 6:56:03 AM

Nadarajah, Jeya Thirumagal (CPSO#: 82790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Ext. 6752
Fax: 9054727621
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeya T. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadarajah ( CPSO# 82790 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Infectious Diseases
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 15 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEYA THIRUMAGAL NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2011 to 02 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009