THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 25/09/2018 9:03:26 PM

Denburg, Avram Ezra (CPSO#: 84275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-7500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVRAM EZRA DENBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010