THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 23/09/2018 7:30:42 PM

Szczepanik, Dorota Maria (CPSO#: 84576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Main Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

75 Spring Street
Sister site of Carleton Place DMH
I have priviliges but never worked
In the Hospital to date
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613 2562514
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613 2533800
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613 7322811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

33 Drummond St West
Perth Site of Perth and Smiths
Falls District Hospital
Have not worked there for last 8ms
Perth ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Szczepanik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Szczepanik ( CPSO# 84576 )

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa Hosiptal Riverside Campus
Main Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8219

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTA MARIA SZCZEPANIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZCZEPANIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009