THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:01:03 PM

Attalla, Hani Fekry (CPSO#: 85465)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hani Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1 High Meadow Place North York ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 30 Sep 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016