THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 11:49:23 AM

Chant, Chris Buff (CPSO#: 86633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex
General Hospital
Room 332
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 246-9797
Fax: (519) 246-9796
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris B. Chant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chant ( CPSO# 86633 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 332
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 246-9797

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS BUFF CHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012