THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 22/02/2019 1:11:05 PM

Leclerc, Renee (CPSO#: 86912)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2008