THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 11:47:07 AM

Amer, Ali (CPSO#: 87114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Abdul-Mhsin, Ali Amir (used until: 05 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2939
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caya Punta Brabo, Aruba
Aruba NA
Aruba
Aruba
Phone: +297 527 4000
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali Amer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amer ( CPSO# 87114 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2015