THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 10/12/2018 3:14:02 AM

Hamilton-Irving, Jonathan Charles (CPSO#: 87484)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liston Hamilton-Irving Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2007 to 21 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2013