THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/08/2018 8:07:30 PM

Kamara, Hawa (CPSO#: 87630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: 905 844 5537
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAWA KAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010