THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 15/11/2018 12:42:10 PM

Gallab, Nagy Fakhry Abd Elmessih (CPSO#: 87724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone: (905) 735-9672
Fax: 9057355597
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Welland County General Hospital
65 Third street
Welland ON  L3B 3L3
Canada
Phone: (905) 3784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Douglas Memorial Hospital
230 Bertie street
Fort Erie ON  L2A1Z2
Canada
Phone: 905 378 4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gallab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gallab ( CPSO# 87724 )

Business Address:
477 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3K4
Phone Number: (905) 735-9672

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGY FAKHRY ABD ELMESSIH GALLAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010