THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 24/06/2018 12:47:06 PM

Chung, Hon Yin Brian (CPSO#: 87748)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 16 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010