THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 6:38:48 AM

Sekhon, Harmanjatinder Singh (CPSO#: 88189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Magadh University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Pathology
CCW, Rm 4220, Box 117,
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. ext. 79036
Fax: (613) 737-8853
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Apr 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Harmanjatinder  Singh  Sekhon  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            anatomical pathology.