THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 14/08/2018 11:16:00 PM

Kanji, Rajandra (CPSO#: 88296)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Kanji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 10 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011