THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 26/09/2018 4:36:17 AM

Ziadi, Maria Cecilia (CPSO#: 88566)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Rosario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011