THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 11/12/2018 3:54:25 PM

Favalli, Gabriela Pereira De Souza (CPSO#: 89965)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Catolica De Pelotas, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009