THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 11/12/2018 2:51:46 PM

Jee, Katie Helen (CPSO#: 90695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Morse, Katie Helen (used until: 12 Nov 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Medicale Ste Anne
Ottawa ON  K1N 9G4
Phone: (613) 789-1552
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Jee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jee ( CPSO# 90695 )
Dr. R. Jee ( CPSO# 86189 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Critical Care Wing Suite 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B307
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE HELEN JEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011