THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/03/2019 2:21:30 AM

Ismail, Plabon Mohammad (CPSO#: 91312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2238
Fax: 705) 549-5084
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

788 Yonge St Suite #1
Midland ON  L4R 2E6
Canada
Phone: (705) 481-1925
Fax: (705) 481-1925
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Plabon Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ismail ( CPSO# 91312 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Business Address:
North Simcoe Therapy Network
788 Yonge Street
Suite 1
Midland ON  L4R 2E6
Phone Number: (705) 481-1925

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PLABON MOHAMMAD ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014