THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/11/2018 8:21:19 PM

Rajakumar, Derek Diroshan (CPSO#: 92619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
University of Ottawa Sports Complex
N203 (2nd Floor) 801 King Edward
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL- GENERAL CAMPUS
501 SMYTH ROAD
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-274-5759
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Timmins and District Hospital
640 Ross Ave E, Timmins, ON
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Canada
Phone: 705-267-6370
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Rajakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rajakumar ( CPSO# 92619 )

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6370

Business Address:
100 Marie Curie PVT
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Business Address:
501 Chemin Smith Road
8 East
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 4-SCN
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK DIROSHAN RAJAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012