THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/03/2019 9:32:55 AM

Levine, Oren Hannun (CPSO#: 93210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
McMaster University
Juravinski Cancer Centre 3rd floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oren Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Levine ( CPSO# 93210 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Oncology
McMaster University
Juravinski Cancer Centre, 3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OREN HANNUN LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016