THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 19/10/2018 1:44:12 PM

Higgins, Anthony Daniel (CPSO#: 93895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

238 Grand River North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

325 James St. North
Hamilton ON  L8L 7W2
Canada
Phone: 905 528 7635
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Higgins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Higgins ( CPSO# 93895 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
238 Grand River North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Business Address:
325 James Street North
Hamilton ON  O8L 7W2
Phone Number: (905) 528-7635

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY DANIEL HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013