THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 11/12/2018 3:12:56 PM

Shrayyef, Muhammad Zakarea (CPSO#: 94214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B3
1148 Winston Churchill Blvd
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Phone: (905) 849-3066
Fax: (905) 849-3065
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shrayyef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shrayyef ( CPSO# 94214 )

Business Address:
B3 - 1148 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Oak Ridges ON  L6J 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 849-0366

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ZAKAREA SHRAYYEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHRAYYEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010