THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 20/08/2018 11:45:42 PM

Belanger, Mathieu (CPSO#: 94840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inovo Medical
1328 Labrie Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1B 3M1
Phone: (613) 749-4668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathieu Belanger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belanger ( CPSO# 94840 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., February 15, 2018, by order of the Discipline Commitee of
            the College of  Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Mathieu Belanger:

                  (I)   Dr. Belanger will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics
                        and professionalism, at his own expense, within (twelve) 12 months
                        of the dateof this Order, or any alternate course in ethics and
                        professionalism approved by the College. Dr. Belanger will agree to
                        abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program and provide proof
                        of  completion to the College;
                  
                  (ii)  Approval of the College's Out of Hospital Premises program is
                        required before Dr. Belanger resumes the Medical Director role in
                        an Out of Hospital Premises.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:

On February 15, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Mathieu Bélanger has 
committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

Dr. Bélanger is a family physician who practises in the area of interventional pain management. 
Dr. Bélanger currently works at, and owns, the Inovo Medical clinic in Ottawa, a clinic that 
provides interventional pain management procedures. Dr. Bélanger was the Medical Director of 
Inovo. Following referral of this matter to discipline and at the request of the College, Dr. 
Bélanger appointed an acting Medical Director, effective August 22, 2017. 

Nerve blocks, which are categorized as Level 2 Interventional Pain Management procedures, are 
only authorized to be performed in an Out-of-Hospital premises (“OHP”) that is approved by the 
College. Between October 15 and January 2016, Dr. Bélanger provided interventional pain 
treatments to patients, including Level 2 nerve blocks, while working in a clinic that was not an 
approved OHP.  

Dr. Bélanger was aware of the requirement that Level 2 procedures can only be performed in an 
OHP that has been approved and that responsibility for notifying the College’s OHP program is 
on the physician. He was aware that the clinic where he was performing Level 2 procedures was 
not an approved OHP, had never been inspected under the Out of Hospital Premises Inspection 
Program, did not meet program requirements and that he was not authorized to provide Level 2 
procedures in that location. 

There is no evidence that Dr. Bélanger’s performance of any of these procedures caused any 
harm to any patients.  

As part of the College investigation, information was obtained from the Ontario Health Insurance 
Plan (“OHIP”). The information from OHIP confirms that Dr. Bélanger submitted claims to 
OHIP between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, for Level 2 procedures, particularly 
nerve blocks, that were performed by Dr. Bélanger at the clinic that was not an approved OHP. 
The OHIP information indicates that between October 21, 2015 and January 13, 2016, Dr. 
Bèlanger billed approximately $103,428.00 for performing Level 2 procedures in the clinic that 
was not an approved OHP, that are only authorized to be performed in an OHP.  

DISPOSITION 

The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Bélanger’s Certificate of Registration for a five (5) month period, 
   effective February 17th, 2018 at 12:01 a.m. 
-  The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bélanger’s 
   Certificate of Registration: 
      o  Dr. Bélanger will successfully complete the PROBE course in ethics and 
         professionalism, at his own expense, within (twelve) 12 months of the date of this 
         Order, or any alternate course in ethics and professionalism approved by the College. 
         Dr. Bélanger  will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program 
         and provide proof of completion to the College; 
      o  Approval of the College’s Out of Hospital Premises program is required before Dr. 
         Bélanger resumes the Medical Director role in an Out of Hospital Premises.  
-  Dr. Bélanger to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Bélanger to pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,500 within 
   ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 15, 2018