THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 18/12/2018 10:53:28 AM

Mourant, Lindsay Michelle (CPSO#: 96433)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Touro College of Osteopathic Medicine NY, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2018