THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/03/2019 12:24:45 PM

Morgan, Erin Robyn (CPSO#: 97156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
Divison of Medical Oncology
790 Commisioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: 519-685-8640
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN ROBYN MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 21 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2017