THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/03/2019 7:51:03 PM

Au-Yeung, Daniel Hsueh Hsin (CPSO#: 97262)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014