THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/03/2019 11:43:12 AM

Sharma, Anuja (CPSO#: 97380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IM Care
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377-7793
Fax: (905) 373-6969
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhargava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 97380 )
Dr. M. Bhargava ( CPSO# 97340 )

Business Address:
Heart Care Cardiac
Wellness Centre
Medical Sciences Building
372 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 268-8882

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (888) 268-8882


Corporation Name: Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New Hampshire

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 16 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            -- Dr. Anuja Sharma may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only. 

            -- As from April 16, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Anuja Sharma, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sharma to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. ANUJA SHARMA
                                          ("Dr. Sharma")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sharma, certificate of registration number 97380, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7214421 (the "Investigation") into
                  allegations about the part of my practice that involves treating
                  conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to comply with the College's Change in Scope
                  process, as set out below.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to practise under the guidance of at least
                        two clinical supervisor(s) who are certified specialists in
                        Dermatology and who are acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"; "Clinical Supervisor A"; "Clinical Supervisor B"),
                        for a minimum of  twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). The
                        Clinical Supervision shall consist of the following elements:
                  
                        i)    an initial period of Clinical Supervision which shall last
                              for a minimum of three (3) months ("Initial Period of
                              Clinical Supervision"), during which time I will schedule all
                              of my cases involving conditions, disorders or diseases of
                              the skin to take place at the office of Clinical Supervisor
                              A. I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that the Initial Period of
                              Clinical Supervision will not terminate until Clinical
                              Supervisor A has observed a minimum of sixty (60) of my cases
                              involving conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin
                              during a period of at least three (3) months; and
                  
                        ii)   an additional period of Clinical Supervision which shall
                              continue for nine (9) months following completion of the
                              Initial Period of Clinical Supervision ("Additional Period of
                              Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that during the entire period of Clinical
                        Supervision I shall maintain a log of all of my cases involving
                        conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertakings, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        Appendix "B", and understand what is required of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s). The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   During the Initial Period of Clinical Supervision, Clinical
                              Supervisor A will meet with me once every week, at a minimum,
                              at the office of the Clinical Supervisor to observe all of my
                              cases involving conditions, disorders or diseases of the
                              skin, unless I do not have any patients presenting for
                              conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin during that
                              week. Clinical Supervisor A will also review all of my
                              patient charts involving conditions, disorders or diseases of
                              the skin, as well as my log of cases involving conditions,
                              disorders or diseases of the skin;
                  
                        (ii)  During the Additional Period of Clinical Supervision,
                              Clinical Supervisor A will meet with me once every month to
                              review twenty (20) of my patient charts involving conditions,
                              disorders or diseases of the skin;
                  
                        (iii) During the Additional Period of Clinical Supervision,
                              Clinical Supervisor B will meet with me at my practice
                              location for one (1) hour once every month to observe my
                              cases involving conditions, disorders or diseases of the
                              skin. I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that during the Additional
                              Period of Clinical Supervision I will schedule cases
                              involving conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin to
                              take place during the visit of the Clinical Supervisor(s). 
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and/or
                              observation;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month during the Initial Period of Clinical Supervision, and
                              once every three (3) months during the Additional Period of
                              Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the report(s) of the medical inspector
                        received by the College on March 27 and July 2, 2015 and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendices "A" and "B" attached, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to ensure that Appendices "A" and "B" to
                        this Undertaking, are signed and delivered to the College within
                        thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" or Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is
                        unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall,
                        within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                        executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified
                        person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is
                        delivered to the College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Sharma, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(f) and/or
                        (g) above, I will cease to provide any care or treatment to
                        patients presenting with conditions, disorders or diseases of the
                        skin until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College.  
                  
                        (i)   I, Dr. Sharma, agree that if I am required to cease to
                              provide any care or treatment to patients presenting with
                              conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin as a result of
                              section (6)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition
                              or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                              term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                              register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   any professional education recommended by my Clinical
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to complete this requirement by twelve
                        (12) months after the completion of my Clinical Supervision or, if
                        no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first
                        possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that, at the end of my Clinical
                        Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendices "A" and "B"
                        attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)"), who shall be a certified specialist in
                        Dermatology.  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sharma, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sharma, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Further Terms

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake that, after the satisfactory completion of
                        all steps required in this Undertaking, if the College is of the
                        view that I have satisfactorily completed the Change in Scope
                        program, I will:
                  
                        (i)   be permitted to refer to myself as an internal medicine
                              specialist, with a special interest in treating conditions,
                              disorders or diseases of the skin. At no time before, during,
                              or after the Change of Scope practice will I refer to myself
                              or my practice using the word "dermatology" or a derivative
                              thereof;
                  
                        (ii)  be permitted to bill my services relating to conditions,
                              disorders or diseases of the skin using a Family Medicine
                              billing code.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge and agree that, after my reassessment as
                        set out above, this portion of my practice shall be restricted to
                        those conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin as the Assessor
                        advises and the College approves, and I will comply with those
                        restrictions. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sharma, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sharma, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Sharma, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (16)  I, Dr. Sharma, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Sharma was the subject of a College investigation into
                        allegations about the part of her practice that involves treating
                        conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin. As a result of the
                        investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Sharma will, with respect to this part of her practice,
                              practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                              acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              Dr. Sharma will engage in professional education. 
                  
                              Dr. Sharma's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College at the end of the period of Clinical
                              Supervision, at which point the extent to which she can treat
                              conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin will be
                              established. 
                  
                              At no time will Dr. Sharma refer to her practice using the
                              words dermatology, dermatologist, or any variation or
                              derivative thereof.
                  
                              At the end of her reassessment, such conditions, disorders or
                              diseases of the skin as Dr. Sharma is permitted to treat
                              shall be billed to OHIP using Family Medicine codes. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Sharma, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Sharma, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Sharma, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisor(s), Chief(s) of Staff and Assessor(s), to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        undertaking set out at Appendix "A" and Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anuja Sharma to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2015:

Dr. Sharma was the subject of a College investigation into allegations about the part of her practice that involves treating conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Sharma will, with respect to this part of her practice, practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Sharma will engage in professional education.

Dr. Sharma’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College at the end of the period of Clinical Supervision, at which point the extent to which she can treat conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin will be established.

At no time will Dr. Sharma refer to her practice using the words dermatology, dermatologist, or any variation or derivative thereof.

At the end of her reassessment, such conditions, disorders or diseases of the skin as Dr. Sharma is permitted to treat shall be billed to OHIP using Family Medicine codes.