THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/03/2019 12:48:24 PM

Nayan, Madhur (CPSO#: 97947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Urology
Suite 9 111
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5L 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3686
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADHUR NAYAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NAYAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. NAYAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NAYAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NAYAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NAYAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NAYAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019