THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/03/2019 12:43:07 PM

Caudarella, Alexander (CPSO#: 97953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
17th floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans ( CPSO# 95580 )
Dr. A. Caudarella ( CPSO# 97953 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
555 University
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
30 Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2P7
Phone Number: (416) 924-4640

Business Address:
3079 Danforth Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 693-8677

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Casey House Hospice Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CAUDARELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUDARELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015