THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/03/2019 11:00:04 AM

Umasuthan, Nishani (CPSO#: 98092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Academic Family Health
Centre
1125 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone: (416) 264-4446
Fax: (416) 264-4456
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nishani Umasuthan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Umasuthan ( CPSO# 98092 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Academic Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 264-4446

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHANI UMASUTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UMASUTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014