Khan, Akbar Nauman (CPSO#: 65249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
4576 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6N4
Phone: (416) 227-0037
Fax: (416) 227-1915
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 29 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Akbar Nauman Khan’s professional misconduct and incompetence have been referred to the Discipline Committee. Dr. Khan is incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of patients. Dr Khan engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his complementary/alternative medicine practice and including with respect to his billing practices.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Akbar Nauman Khan,
            pusuant to section (x) of the order made by the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario,
            effective September 30, 2017:

                  Dr. Akbar Nauman Khan has ceased to provide chemotherapy until such time
                  as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College, and
                  provided the Clinical Supervisor's signed undertaking to the College.
                  
                  
            As from 12:01 a.m., September 30, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints
            and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Akbar Nauman Khan:

            (i)   Dr. Khan shall practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s)
                  acceptable to the College in respect of his provision of chemotherapy to
                  patients (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)").  

            (ii)  Dr. Khan acknowledges that he has reviewed the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                  undertaking, attached as Appendix "B" to the Order, and understands what
                  is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and the Clinical Supervision: 

                  i.    Dr. Khan shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor(s) once a week;
                  
                  ii.   At the initial meeting, Dr. Khan shall review the patient records
                        for each patient receiving chemotherapy from Dr. Khan. The Clinical
                        Supervisor's review shall include a review of all testing,
                        diagnostic imaging and other results, as well as the treatment plan
                        and diagnosis; 
                  
                  iii.  At each subsequent meeting, the Clinical Supervisor shall review
                        the patient records for each patient (who is receiving chemotherapy
                        from Dr. Khan) who were either treated during the week, or for whom
                        test results were received; 
                  
                  iv.   The Clinical Supervisor shall ensure that conventional diagnosis
                        and treatment plans as well as risks associated with treatment
                        plans are documented in the charts. The Clinical Supervisor shall
                        satisfy himself/herself that conventional diagnosis and treatment
                        plans as well as risks associated with treatment plans have been
                        communicated to patients, including as it pertains to test results
                        obtained throughout the course of the treatment;
                  
                  v.    The Clinical Supervisor shall, at least once a month, observe Dr.
                        Khan in practice administering chemotherapy;
                  
                  vi.   The Clinical Supervisor shall discuss any concerns arising from the
                        chart reviews or observation; 
                  
                  vii.  The Clinical Supervisor shall perform any other duties, such as
                        reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                        colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to  his
                        Clinical Supervision; and
                  
                  viii. The Clinical Supervisor shall submit written reports to the College
                        at least once every month, or immediately if the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) has concerns about Dr. Khan's standard of practice or
                        that Dr. Khan's patients may be exposed to the risk of harm or
                        injury.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Khan shall fully cooperate with the clinical supervision, and shall
                  abide by any recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s). Without
                  limiting the foregoing, if during or after an observation or a chart
                  review the Clinical Supervisor is of the view that Dr. Khan's conduct or
                  care will put a patient or patients at risk, Dr. Khan shall immediately
                  comply with any recommendation made by the Clinical Supervisor(s) to
                  protect the patient(s) from risk. 

            (iv)  Dr. Khan shall maintain a log of all patients receiving chemotherapy,
                  which shall include the dates of each visit, and testing or diagnostic
                  imagining ordered and received and the treatment provided. 

            (v)   Dr. Khan shall, within five (5) days of the date of the Order, provide
                  the College with the addresses of any locations where he practises
                  medicine, and, if he commences practice at a new location, shall provide
                  the College with its address within five (5) days. 

            (vi)  Dr. Khan  shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor(s)
                  to each other and to the College  and by the College to the Clinical
                  Supervisor(s) of all information the Clinical Supervisor(s) or the
                  College deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfil the Clinical
                  Superivisor(s)' undertaking and to monitor Dr. Khan's compliance with the
                  Order.

            (vii) Dr. Khan shall within five (5) days of the Order provide the College with
                  his irrevocable consent to make inquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance
                  Plan, attached at Appendix "C" to the Order, in order for the College to
                  monitor his compliance with the terms of the Order.

            (viii)Dr. Khan must ensure that Appendix "B" to the Order is signed and
                  delivered to the College within ten (10) days of the date of the Order.

            (ix)  If a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "B" to the Order is
                  unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Khan
                  shall, within ten (10) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an
                  executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time.

            (x)   If Dr. Khan is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions
                  set out under sections (viii) and (ix) above, he shall cease providing
                  chemotherapy until such time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            (xi)  If Dr. Khan is required to cease providing chemotherapy as a result of
                  section (x) above, this will constitute a term, condition or limitation
                  on his Certificate of Registration and that term, condition or limitation
                  will be included on the public register.

            (xii) Dr. Khan will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections
                  of his Practice Location(s) and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor his compliance with the provisions of the
                  Order.

            (xiii)Dr. Khan shall be responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges,
                  and expenses arising from the implementation of the Order.