skip to content

Statements

Print page icon

Media contact
[email protected]

12/14/2023 CPSO Board Approves Governance Modernization Initiatives Through By-law Changes 8/23/2023 CPSO's Statement on Jordan Peterson v. College of Psychologists of Ontario 7/31/2023 Reducing Barriers and Improving Access to Care 4/4/2023 CPSO Removes Barriers for Internationally Educated Physicians 1/16/2023 CPSO Limiting Public Building Access 12/6/2022 CPSO Honoured for Utilizing Technology to Become More Efficient, Responsive 11/21/2022 Misrepresentation of College Guidance 6/3/2022 Monitoring of Monkeypox Cases in Ontario 9/1/2021 CPSO\OPSDT Launches New Website for Discipline Tribunal 6/21/2021 CPSO Creates a More Independent and Efficient Discipline Process 4/30/2021 Statement on Public Health Misinformation 3/17/2021 Adjudicator Positions 1/28/2021 Distress and Suicide Recognition and Response Project 3/6/2020 CPSO is #EachForEqual 1/20/2020 Introducing eDialogue 12/6/2019 CPSO Honours Dr. “Michelle” Hladunewich for Transforming the lives of Women with Pregnancy-Related Kidney Disorders 11/25/2019 Recognizing Intimate Partner Violence — in Our Patients and Colleagues 9/30/2019 Dr. Mark Spiller Honoured for his Leadership, Commitment to Community 9/20/2019 Council approves Continuity of Care policies 6/6/2019 Dr. Marie Gear Honoured for a Career of Service, Excellence 5/1/2019 Celebrating Ontario Doctors 3/6/2019 Dr. Rayfel Schneider: SickKids leader in pediatric rheumatology to receive CPSO Council Award 2/1/2019 Statement from Dr. Nancy Whitmore 12/10/2018 Dr. Peeter Poldre Assumes Role as New President of the College Of Physicians and Surgeons Of Ontario 12/7/2018 Dr. Sheila Laredo to Join CPSO as the College’s First Chief Medical Advisor 9/4/2018 Dr. Jason Malinowski: Barry’s Bay Family Physician Receives CPSO Council Award 8/24/2018 Statement by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 5/24/2018 Dr. Sarah Reid: Ottawa leader in pediatric emergency medicine receives CPSO Council Award 2/13/2018 Dr. Nancy Whitmore to Join CPSO as Registrar/CEO 1/31/2018 CPSO’s Effective Referral Requirement Affirmed by Superior Court 11/30/2017 Dr. Kenneth Fung: Advocate for culturally sensitive mental health 9/8/2017 CPSO Releases Interim Opioid Strategy Progress Update 9/7/2017 Dr. Michael Stephenson, Kitchener champion of refugee health, receives CPSO Council Award 6/13/2017 CPSO defends patients’ rights to access health services 5/23/2017 Dr. William Gary Smith of Orillia receives CPSO Council Award 5/8/2017 College Welcomes 2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Pain 4/3/2017 Registrar Dr. Rocco Gerace Stepping Down 4/3/2017 CPSO begins legal proceeding against person practising medicine without a licence 2/21/2017 Dr. Shazia Ambreen of Alliston receives Council Award