Dialogue Magazine: Archives

  • 2017

    Volume 13, Issue 3, 2017

    16/10/2017 Opioid Investigations – Status Report; Opioid Position Statement; Patient Perspectives – “Anything to be Numb”; Patient Perspectives – After the Fall; Opining on Opioids; Services During Public Health Emergencies; New Governance Model for CNO; Ensuring Competence; The Impact of Bill 87

    Volume 13, Issue 2, 2017

    23/06/2017 Peer Assessment Evolves with New Tools; Drug Safety Expert Urges a Re-evaluation of Opioids; Opioid Strategy; New Guideline for Opioid Prescribing; Accepting New Patients; Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship; MAiD Protections; “Liberation” Therapy Debunked; Choosing Wisely; Patient Ombudsman Reflects on First Year

    Volume 13, Issue 1, 2017

    21/03/2017 Bill 87 - Protecting Patients Act; Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees; Opioid Narcotics Atlas; Gaining Control; Mifegymiso Guidance

  • 2016

    Volume 12, Issue 4, 2016

    31/12/2016 Accepting New Patients - Consultation; Ending the Physician-Patient Relationship – Consultation; Introducing [new president];eHealth Ontario – Progress Report; Mandatory Reporting for Sexual Abuse; Heroes of Medical Regulation; and Addressing the Opioid Overdose Crisis: Ontario begins to make data from its Narcotics Monitoring System available to prescribers; College commits to specific action within our own mandate; ISMP Canada’s opioid prescribing messages for community physicians; Dramatic variation of opioid use, deaths across the province; College hosts conference for methadone prescribers

    Volume 12, Issue 3, 2016

    12/10/2016 Articles addressing different aspects of opioid prescribing: Function is Key, New Requirements for Fentanyl Patches, Dangers of Abrupt Cessation, and Naloxone Availability an Opportunity for Discussions; and The Newest Disposition – Remedial Agreements

    Volume 12, Issue 2, 2016

    11/07/2016 Continuity of Care Conversation – What Do You Think?; Expectations of Professional Behaviour; Opioid Guidelines Urge Caution; Regulations Target Fentanyl Abuse; Celebrating 150 years!

    Volume 12, Issue 1, 2016

    04/04/2016 Physician-Assisted Death Guidance; Treating Those Closest to You; Expanding Access to Naloxone

  • 2015

    Volume 11, Issue 4, 2015

    31/12/2015 A Bigger Educational Impact; Physician-Assisted Death Guidance; The Year Ahead; A Closer Look at Regulation; Transparency Initiative Update; Update on Sexual Abuse Initiative; Appreciation

    Volume 11, Issue 3, 2015

    20/10/2015 A Duty to Report, A Chance to Protect; Top 10 Infection Control Breaches; New End-of-Life Care Policy; Why Hiring Patients is Not Advised

    Volume 11, Issue 2, 2015

    06/07/2015 Treating Loved Ones; Breaches of Privacy; Focus on Sexual Abuse; More Info to Be Made Public

    Volume 11, Issue 1, 2015

    13/04/2015 Professional Obligations and Human Rights; Targeting Risky Infection Practices; Marijuana for Medical Purposes; Focusing on Sexual Abuse

  • 2014

    Volume 10, Issue 4, 2014

    31/12/2014 The Guardians of Medical Governance; Proposing Changes to Public Register; Reviewing Sexual Abuse Legislation; Consulting on Three Policies

    Volume 10, Issue 3, 2014

    22/10/2014 Marijuana for Medical Purposes – Policy Consultation; MDs’ Relationship with Industry; Best Practices for Infection Control; New Strategy for Data Sharing

    Volume 10, Issue 2, 2014

    14/07/2014 Telemedicine – Policy Consultation; “Think of Yourself as a Coach”; Taking a Closer Look at the Public Register; Delegating Controlled Acts

    Volume 10, Issue 1, 2014

    09/04/2014 Managing Relationships with Industry; Online Voting Here to Stay; Choosing Wisely Canada; Breaking the ICE with Your Patients

  • 2013

    Volume 9, Issue 4, 2013

    31/12/2013 A Culture of Care; Treating Self and Family; Meet the New President; Patient Safety Recommendations

    Volume 9, Issue 3, 2013

    06/10/2013 Regulatory bodies in the age of open information; Certification of Death at Home; Preventing the Doorknob Syndrome; MDs Identify Problems with CPSO Proposal

    Volume 9, Issue 2, 2013

    04/07/2013 CPSO Registers Doctor #100,000; Preparing for eHealth Developments; Thinking of Running for Council Election?; Reporting Adverse Events in OHPs

    Volume 9, Issue 1, 2013

    01/04/2013 20 Years of Dialogue; The Importance of Advance Care Planning; OHP Inspection Results Posted to Website; Our New Social Media Profile

  • 2012

    Volume 8, Issue 4, 2012

    31/12/2012 Engaged and Entrusted; Getting an Education in Palliative Care; Connecting with an eHealth World; Getting the Most Out of Your CPD

    Volume 8, Issue 3, 2012

    05/10/2012 Beginning a Dialogue on End-of-life Care; Vote in Upcoming Council Election; The "Key" Conversation about Driving Fitness; Reporting Adverse Events in OHPs

    Volume 8, Issue 2, 2012

    05/07/2012 Calling all Script Writers; Run for Election; To Report or Not to Report?; Perils of Self-Disclosure

    Volume 8, Issue 1, 2012

    29/03/2012 Defining Scope of Practice; Requests for Legislative Change; Tracking your CPD Credits; Switching Patients from OxyContin

Subscribe to Patient Compass

A free electronic newsletter for the public from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

  • Updates on critical initiatives
  • News on College policies
  • Calls for public consultation