Unregistered Practitioners

The following listing provides information about individuals who have been identified as "unregistered practitioners". An unregistered practitioner refers to the following:

  1. a person who has been practising medicine without a certificate of registration authorizing the person to do so and without being properly delegated to do so by an Ontario-registered doctor; and/or
  2. a person who has been holding him/herself out as a doctor or physician in contravention of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 or the Medicine Act, 1991.

The unregistered practitioners are identified alphabetically by surname and additional information is viewable by expanding each section.

George Glumac

On October 17, 2016 the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario obtained an order from the Ontario Superior Court of Justice against George Glumac ordering him to refrain from using the title “doctor” and any variation or abbreviation in the course of providing or offering to provide health care, including counselling and psychotherapy, to individuals in Ontario.

Mr. Glumac was also ordered to refrain from using the title physician, “psychiatrist”, “retired psychiatrist” or “shrink” and to refrain from holding himself out as a person who is qualified to practice in Ontario as a physician or in any specialty of medicine, including psychiatry. He was ordered to refrain from performing any controlled acts, including administering any diagnostic  tests and communicating a diagnosis.

Mr. Glumac must refrain from displaying or referring to the following on any website (including any Facebook page, LinkedIn profile, Youtube channel or Twitter feed), brochure,  business card etc. or other document or thing connected to the provision of health care services, any references to the title “Dr”, “shrink”, “psychiatrist”, “retired psychiatrist”, or any references that he was a physician or psychiatrist  and any references to clients as “patients”.

Please see the attached document for more details.

Rabbani-Rassouli, Javad

On October 9, 2014, Javad Rabbani-Rassouli was found guilty of the following offences:

  1. using the title "Doctor" contrary to section 33(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991;
  2. performing a Controlled Act contrary to section 27(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 on or about the 29th day of September 2012, at 55 Doncaster Avenue in the City of Markham in the Regional Municipality of York Region; and
  3. performing a Controlled Act contrary to section 27(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 on or about the 5th day of May 2013, at 124 Boake Trail in the Town of Richmond Hill in the Regional Municipality of York Region.

Mr. Rabbani-Rassouli admitted that he used the title Doctor in the course of providing or offering to provide, in Ontario, health care to an individual when he is not authorized to do so. Mr. Rabbani-Rassouli also admitted that, on the two occasions set out above, he administered a substance by injection thereby performing controlled acts that he was not authorized to perform.

On January 15, 2015, Mr. Rabbani-Rassouli was sentenced to a fine of $2,000 for the offence of using the title "Doctor" contrary to section 33(1) of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991. He was also sentenced to a fine of $2,000 ($1,000 per count) for the offences of performing controlled acts that he was not authorized to perform.

Please see the attached documents for more details:
Information and Summons
Agreed Statement of Facts - Finding
Agreed Statement of Facts - Penalty

Seltzer, Allan Zangwill

On June 28, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario obtained an order from the Ontario Superior Court of Justice against Allan Zangwill Seltzer ordering him to refrain from using the title “doctor” and any variation or abbreviation in the course of providing or offering to provide health care, counselling and psychotherapy to individuals in Ontario. He was also ordered to refrain from using the title physician and to refrain from holding himself out as a person who is qualified to practice in Ontario as a physician or in a specialty of medicine, including psychiatry. He was ordered to refrain from using the title “psychiatrist” and any related designations including MD, FRCP, MRCP, MRCPsych, and DipPsyc and ordered to remove and permanently refrain from advertising in any format any information that references himself as a “doctor”, “physician” or “psychiatrist” or uses any titles or claims about related designations in connection with his provision of counseling, psychotherapy or other health care services.

Please see the attached document for more details.
Court Order

On July 20, 2016, Allan Zangwill Seltzer pleaded guilty and was convicted on one count of fraud under $5,000, contrary to s. 380(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada. He was sentenced to pay a fine of $1,000 and a victim surcharge of $300. A probation order was imposed for a period of six months. While he is subject to the probation order, Allan Zangwill Seltzer is prohibited from:

  • Representing himself in any way as a doctor, “MD”, psychiatrist or physician unless properly licensed as per the requirements of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;
  • Providing therapy, counselling or treatment to any person in exchange for money or other remuneration;
  • Dispensing any medication

Please see the attached document for more details.

In addition, Allan Zangwill Seltzer used to be, but is no longer, a member of the College. More information about him can be found under his profile on the public register.

Stewart, Eve

On May 22, 2014, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario obtained an order from the Ontario Superior Court of Justice against Eve Stewart directing her to refrain from performing all controlled acts and other acts relating to the practice of medicine under the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 and the Medicine Act, 1991. Ms. Stewart does not have a certificate of registration to practise medicine and is affiliated with Eve’s Laser Clinic, 13 Viewmount Drive, Ottawa, Ontario. This order was preceded by an interim order of the court on March 6, 2014 against Ms. Stewart with similar prohibitions.

Please see the attached documents for more details:
Interim Order
Court Order
News release: CPSO begins legal proceeding against person practising medicine without a licence