Discipline Committee Schedule

All hearings are held at the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, 80 College Street, Toronto, and commence at 9:00 a.m. in the first floor hearing chamber, unless otherwise stated. The physician’s current practice location as indicated on the Public Register is noted. This schedule is subject to change. If you plan to attend, or for further information, please contact the Communications Department by email or by telephone at 416-967-2611.

Directions to the College available here.


February 2017

Doctor

Hearing Date

Summary of Allegations

FAZAL, Haydarally Hasanalee
*(Markham)

January 30 – February 2

Will be held in the third floor Council Chambers

  • Engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

MROZEK, Michal Edmund
*(Rexdale)

February 1, 2017
Adjournment Motion

Will be held in the third floor Council Chambers 9 to 11:30 a.m.

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

GALEA, Anthony M.
*(Etobicoke)

February 8
Motion

Will be held in the third floor Council Chambers

  • Having been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

BARNARD, Thomas J.
*(Windsor)

February 13

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

YAGHINI, Reza
*(Thornbury)

February 13

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

ROBERTS, Jeremy K.A.
*(Practice address not available)

February 21
Motion - Application for Reinstatement

On November 3, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roberts committed an act of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that he committed an act of professional misconduct that would be an act of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario. The Committee ordered, amongst other things, revocation of Dr. Roberts’ certificate of registration.

GHABBOUR, Nagi N.R.
*(Toronto)

February 21 and 22

Will be held at ASAP Reporting Services Inc., 333 Bay Street, Toronto

  • Engaged in sexual abuse of a patient
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

HILL, David James
*(Practice address not available)

February 22
Penalty Hearing

On December 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. David James Hill committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Hill was incompetent.

FUNG, Wing-Tai
*(Scarborough)

February 23
Reprimand

On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Fung committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise and in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of misconduct as defined in the regulations. The Committee ordered, amongst other things, a reprimand.

REMILLARD, Timothy
*(Thornbury)

February 27

Will be held in the third floor Council Chambers

  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 

March 2017

Doctor

Hearing Date

Summary of Allegations

BEAIRSTO, William Arthur Damian
*(Practice address not available)

March 6-7
(Penalty Hearing)

On August 5, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beairsto committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

PARDIS, Bijan
*(Markham)

March 8

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Incompetence.

HILL, David James
*(Practice address not available)

March 9
(Penalty Hearing)

On December 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. David James Hill committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Hill was incompetent.

ROCHE, Susan Louise
*(Orleans)

March 13

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

FENTON, Peter Michael
*(Toronto)

March 20-24

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence

YAGHINI, Reza
*(Barrie)

March 27-29

On December 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

ASTAWAN, Leanne
*(Kitchener)

March 27-31
 
Will be held in the third floor Council Chambers

  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.
  • Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
  • Incompetence.

Directions to CPSO, 80 College Street, Toronto, ON

(north side of College at Elizabeth Street)

By public transit

  • From the Queen's Park subway station (University-Spadina line): one block east of University Avenue
  • From the College subway station (Yonge line): two blocks west of Yonge Street
  • The Carlton/College streetcar stops in front of the CPSO at Elizabeth Street/Dr. Emily Stowe Way

Parking

Underground parking is available at College Park, 777 Bay Street. Enter on the east side of Bay Street, south of College.

View Larger Map