News Release

Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Alan Ross Laing; Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin; Dr. Andrew Sai-Chak Shum; Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt October 31, 2013

Oct 31, 2013

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) released the results of its most recent disciplinary hearings. The College is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Hearings are held to review allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence, and are open to the public. The following are brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. The Discipline Committee’s full decisions and reasons for decisions are posted on the College’s website as they become available. Full decisions are located by entering the doctor’s name in the All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca

Dr. Alan Ross Laing, (no practice address). On September 4, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Laing committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Laing admitted the allegation. 

Dr. Laing failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to 25 patients, and exposed his patients to risk of harm, based on various deficiencies in his psychotherapy practice, including sub-standard record-keeping, sub-standard care and boundary violations. 

Dr. Laing has executed an undertaking to the College by which he has resigned his certificate of registration effective October 10, 2013; he will never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after that date; and he was subject to continued supervision of his practice until his resignation took effect on October 10, 2013. 

In the circumstances, the Committee ordered a public reprimand and directed that Dr. Laing pay the College costs in the amount of $4,460. 

Dr. Sammy Joe Sliwin, Toronto. On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sliwin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused a patient, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 

Dr. Sliwin had a sexual relationship with his patient, Ms. A, during the currency of a doctor-patient relationship. This sexual relationship, which included sexual intercourse, constitutes sexual abuse of a patient under section 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. 

To maintain a doctor-patient relationship with Ms. A while engaging in a sexual relationship in the same time period, knowing it to be wrong, disregards the well understood principle that this is not in a patient's best interest and violates the clear prohibition of the College against such conduct. Dr. Sliwin also failed to maintain proper boundaries with Ms. A over the long period he was her physician. The Committee found this to be disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. 

A penalty hearing is scheduled on February 13, 14, 18 and 19, 2014. 

Dr. Andrew Sai-Chak Shum, (no practice address). On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shum committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Shum is incompetent. Dr. Shum admitted the allegations. 

Dr. Shum's infection control procedures and his maintenance of equipment in performing urologic procedures did not meet the standard of practice of the profession. He displayed a lack of both judgment and knowledge regarding what is required to safely practice invasive procedures in the ambulatory care setting. His multiple reprocessing and practice breaches put patients at risk of bacterial and viral cross-colonization or infections. 

Multiple deficiencies were identified in Dr. Shum's urologic practice, including with respect to prostate biopsy and cystoscopy, prostate cancer care, microscopic hematuria evaluation, and management of urethral stenosis including urethral dilatation. Dr. Shum failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his family practice with respect to record-keeping and displayed a lack of knowledge with respect to various types of preventative screening. Dr. Shum's practice exposed patients to potential risk of harm. 

On September 19, 2012, the Inquires, Complaints and Reports Committee ordered and directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, without notice, under s. 37(6) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. He has not practised medicine since that date. 

The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand and directed that Dr. Shum's certificate of registration be revoked, effective immediately. 

Dr. Shum was further ordered to pay the College costs in the amount of $4,460. 

Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt, Sarnia. On October 3, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pratt committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Pratt admitted the allegation. 

Dr. Pratt submitted swabs from herself for testing for Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus ("MRSA") and disguised them under the name and identity of an employee without the knowledge and/or consent of that individual. After learning she was MRSA positive, she treated herself for the MRSA and returned to her regular duties as a surgeon at the hospital without seeking medical care from any other physician and without confirming she was no longer colonized with MRSA. She also failed to take reasonable steps to ensure the accuracy of the health record of the staff member under whose name she had submitted for testing. 

In addition to antibiotics for MRSA, Dr. Pratt repeatedly prescribed other medication for herself between 2006 and 2012 contrary to College policy. 

Dr. Pratt has taken a boundaries and record-keeping course, as well as attended educational sessions relevant to surgical site infections and ethics. 

The Committee ordered a public reprimand and directed that Dr. Pratt's certificate of registration be suspended for three months commencing on October 4, 2013. 

Dr. Pratt was further ordered to pay the College costs in the amount of $4,460.