News Release

Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Sami J.G. Karkanis; Dr. Wieslawa H. Moore

Apr 29, 2013

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) released the results of its most recent disciplinary hearings. The College is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Hearings are held to review allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence, and are open to the public. The following are brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. The Discipline Committee’s full decisions and reasons for decisions are posted on the College’s website as they become available. Full decisions are located by entering the doctor’s name in the Doctor Search section of the College’s website under All Doctors Search

Dr. Sami J.G. Karkanis, Ajax. On November 16, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Karkanis committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Karkanis contested the allegations.
Dr. Karkanis specializes in obstetrics and gynaecology and has practised in Ajax and Pickering.

The Committee found that Dr. Karkanis made repeated inappropriate comments to his patient, Ms. X, concerning the attractiveness of her abdominal skin while touching her abdomen in 2002 and 2003, and that this conduct constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee also found that Dr. Karkanis sexually abused Ms. X during a pelvic examination in 2006, through inappropriately touching Ms. X's clitoris and repeatedly inserting his fingers in and out of Ms. X's vagina, and through making remarks of a sexual nature towards the patient. The Committee further determined that Dr. Karkanis' conduct during this appointment constitutes conduct that is disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On April 10, 2013, the Committee ordered a public reprimand and the revocation of Dr. Karkanis' certificate of registration. Dr. Karkanis is to reimburse the College for any funding provided to the patient for therapy and counselling, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts, in the amount of $18,520. Dr. Karkanis was further ordered to pay the College costs in the amount of $14,600.

Dr. Wieslawa H. Moore, Woodbridge. On April 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Moore committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

Dr. Moore met Mr. X in the spring of 2002, while Mr. X was completing a renovation contract at the clinic where she worked. Dr. Moore hired Mr. X to do renovations on her home in the summer of 2002. In 2002, Dr. Moore and Mr. X began a romantic and sexual relationship. Shortly thereafter, Mr. X moved into Dr. Moore's home with Dr. Moore and her daughter.

Between approximately 2002 and 2004, Dr. Moore provided isolated and incidental medical services to Mr. X, including sending Mr. X for testing and administering immunization shots. She did not inform Mr. X's family doctor about all of the care she provided. Dr. Moore did not bill OHIP for these services or maintain a patient chart. Dr. Moore states that the romantic relationship ended in or around March 2004.

Between April 24, 2005 and July 28, 2005, Dr. Moore saw Mr. X as a patient at the clinic where she was employed on four occasions.

Between April 24, 2005 and December 29, 2005, Dr. Moore provided medical services to her daughter, Ms. Y at the clinic where she worked. She also referred Ms. Y to other physicians for follow up treatment and care. Dr. Moore billed OHIP for her services.

By providing medical treatment to Ms. Y and Mr. X, Dr. Moore failed to recognize and maintain appropriate boundaries, and caused potential confusion as to whether she was acting in a professional or personal role in providing medical treatment.

The Committee ordered a public reprimand, and directed the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration of Dr. Moore:

  • Dr. Moore must successfully complete, at her own expense, the College's Understanding Boundaries in Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship course, within 12 months of the date of this Order.

Dr. Moore was further ordered to pay the College costs in the amount of $3,650.