News Release

2015 - 7 - 29 - Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Inge Vasovich; Dr. Mary Elizabeth McIntyre; Dr. Eleazar Noriega

Jul 29, 2015

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

July 29, 2015

Dr. Inge Vasovich, Hamilton. On June 30, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vasovich committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Vasovich admitted to the allegation.

A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Vasovich’s profile.

Dr. Mary Elizabeth McIntyre, no practice address. On July 6, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. McIntyre committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she sexually abused a patient; she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and she engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. McIntyre admitted to the allegations, except for the allegation of sexual abuse of a patient (Ms. Y), and the allegation of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation Ms. Y.

The penalty hearing has been scheduled for October 13, 2015.

A detailed summary of the decision is available on the public register at Dr. McIntyre’s profile.

Dr. Eleazar Noriega, Toronto. On November 3, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Noriega committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Noriega had denied the allegations.

On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty. A detailed summary of the decision and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Noriega’s profile.

Dr. Javad Peirovy, Toronto. On July 17, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peirovy committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he sexually abused patients; he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; and he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. Dr. Peirovy had denied the allegations.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision is available on the public register at Dr. Peirovy’s profile.