News Release

2016 - 11 - 28 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Jan Pieter Lucas; Dr. Francesca Anne Di Paola; Dr. Barbara Anne Pilarski; Dr. Kevin Johnston; Dr. Romulo Fanio Anastasio Jr.; Dr. Paramjit Gill; Dr. Somchai Jiaravuthisan; Dr. Murray Bruce Wilson; Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing

Nov 28, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Jan Pieter Lucas, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On October 27, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lucas has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, including with respect to his infection control practices, documentation, and preoperative assessments.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Lucas’ profile.

Dr. Francesca Anne Di Paola, Toronto
On October 27, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Di Paola has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, specifically, by repeatedly accessing confidential and sensitive personal health information of Patients A and B without consent or legal authority, when she knew she had no authority to do so, and by acting in a conflict of interest in relation to Patient A’s care.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Di Paola’s profile.

Dr. Barbara Anne Pilarski, Toronto
On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pilarski committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available at Dr. Pilarski’s profile.

Dr. Kevin Johnston, formerly Dr. Kevin Richard Speight (no practice address)
Formerly Toronto, Cambridge, St. Catharines, Mississauga, Guelph and Kitchener.
On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Johnston committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Johnston’s profile.

Dr. Romulo Fanio Anastasio Jr., (no practice address) formerly Hamilton
On November 1, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Anastasio committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; contravened a term, condition, or limitation on his certificate of registration; and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available at Dr. Anastasio’s profile.

Dr. Paramjit Gill, Brampton
On November 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise; and he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on Dr. Gill’s profile.

Dr. Somchai Jiaravuthisan, (no practice address) formerly Oshawa
On November 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jiaravuthisan has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct; and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s profile.

Dr. Murray Bruce Wilson, Bradford
On November 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wilson has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Wilson’s profile.

Dr. Kulbir Singh Billing, Kitchener
On November 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Billing committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A penalty hearing is scheduled to begin on January 16, 2017.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Billing’s profile.