News Release

2016 - 12 - 21 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Wing-Tai Fung; Dr. James Wen Young; Dr. David James Hill; Dr. Ravi Kakar; Dr. Christopher Pinto

Dec 21, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Wing-Tai Fung, (no practice address) formerly Scarborough
On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wing-Tai Fung committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of misconduct as defined in the regulations.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Fung’s profile.

Dr. James Wen Young, Toronto
On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. James Wen Young committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Young’s profile. The Committee’s decision on penalty has not as yet been released.

Dr. David James Hill, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On December 2, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. David James Hill has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Hill is incompetent.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence is available at Dr. Hill’s profile.

Dr. Ravi Kakar, Markham
On December 12, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ravi Kakar has committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct. The Committee also found that Dr. Kakar is incompetent.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Kakar’s profile.

Dr. Christopher Pinto, Toronto
On December 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Christopher Pinto committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on Dr. Pinto’s profile.