News Release

2016 - 5 - 26 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai; Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan; Dr. William Maclaren Muirhead; Dr. Julie Lee Clowater; Dr. Atef Malak Shehata Ghali

May 26, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Sherapartap Singh Rai, Brampton. On January 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rai has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. On May 6, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee at Dr. Rai’s profile.

Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan, Sudbury. On May 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Syan has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee at Dr. Syan’s profile.

Dr. William Maclaren Muirhead (no practice address). On May 17, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Muirhead has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee at Dr. Muirhead’s profile.

Dr. Julie Lee Clowater, Chatham. On May 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clowater has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct at Dr. Clowater’s profile.

Dr. Atef Malak Shehata Ghali, Orleans. On May 24, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ghali has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Discipline Committee at Dr. Ghali’s profile.