News Release

2016 - 7 - 25 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Douglas Earl Brooks; Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin; Dr. Anthony Richard Eldon Laws; Dr. Clary Jefferson Foote

Jul 25, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Douglas Earl Brooks, Sault Ste. Marie. On July 4, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Brooks committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered at Dr. Brooks’ profile.

Dr. Judi Dianne Marcin, Woodstock. On March 30, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Marcin committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she has been found guilty of an offence relevant to her suitability to practise; engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct; failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; contravened terms, conditions, or limitations on her certificate of registration; and engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. The Committee also found that Dr. Marcin is incompetent.

More information is available on the public register about the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty order released by the Discipline Committee on July 7, 2016, at Dr. Marcin’s profile.

Dr. Anthony Richard Eldon Laws, (no practice address). On July 14, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Laws committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered at Dr. Laws’ profile.

Dr. Clary Jefferson Foote, Hamilton. On January 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Foote committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

More information is available on the public register about the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty order released by the Discipline Committee on July 19, 2016, at Dr. Foote’s profile.