News Release

2016 - 8 - 31 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Julie Lee Clowater; Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans; Dr. Ali Ali Abdulla Mansour; Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor; Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto; Dr. Medhat Nader Ramzy; Dr. Ira Michael Price; Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero

Aug 31, 2016

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario.  Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public.  The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results.  A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available.  To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Julie Lee Clowater, Chatham
On May 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clowater committed an act of professional misconduct in that she engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. On July 22, 2016, the Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Clowater’s profile.

Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans, Coe Hill
On November 7, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kamermans committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Kamermans is incompetent.  On July 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Kamermans’ profile.

Dr. Ali Ali Abdulla Mansour, Toronto
On July 27, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr.  Mansour committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct and he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and incompetence, and the penalty ordered by the Committee is available on the public register at Dr. Mansour’s profile.

Dr. Andrew Winston Taylor, Niagara Falls
On July 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Taylor committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled. A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Taylor’s profile.

Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto, Toronto
On August 5, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beairsto committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.  A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Beairsto’s profile.

Dr. Medhat Nader Ramzy, Toronto
On August 9, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ramzy committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered is available on the public register at Dr. Ramzy’s profile.

Dr. Ira Michael Price, Hamilton
On August 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Price committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered is available on the public register at Dr. Price’s profile.

Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero, Toronto
On August 23, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ruggiero committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.  A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Ruggiero’s profile.