News Release

2017 - 1 - 31 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Gerard Michael MacNeil; Dr. Reza Yaghini; Dr. Gerald Wayne Powell; Dr. Martin M.S. Lee; Dr. Marc Jeffrey Podell

Jan 31, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Gerard Michael MacNeil, (no practice address) formerly Dorchester
On December 20, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. MacNeil committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. MacNeil’s profile.

Dr. Reza Yaghini, Barrie and Thornbury
On December 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Yaghini’s profile. Dr. Yaghini is appealing the decision.

Dr. Gerald Wayne Powell, Ottawa
On January 10, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Powell committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to his billing practices.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available at Dr. Powell’s profile.

Dr. Martin M.S. Lee, Mississauga
On January 17, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lee committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he engaged in disgraceful dishonorable or unprofessional conduct.
A penalty hearing is to be scheduled.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Lee’s profile.

Dr. Marc Jeffrey Podell, Mississauga
On January 23, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Podell committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on Dr. Podell’s profile.