News Release

2017 - 10 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto; Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin; Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek; Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird

Oct 30, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the “Public Information & Services – Find a Doctor” section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca to view “Details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. William Arthur Damian Beairsto, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On August 5, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Beairsto committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct.

On November 4, 2016, the Discipline Committee granted an adjournment of the scheduled penalty hearing on terms including that Dr. Beairsto’s certificate of registration be suspended pending the outcome of the proceeding.

On March 6, 7 and 31, 2017, the Committee heard evidence and submissions on penalty and costs, and received supplementary written submissions on penalty on April 7, 2017. Subsequent to the Committee’s deliberations on the oral and written submissions but prior to the release of the Committee’s decision on penalty, the Committee received further written submissions on amendments to section 51 of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 that came into force on May 30, 2017. On October 5, 2017, the Committee released its penalty decision.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Beairsto’s profile.

Dr. Mohammed Abdullah H Al Abdulmohsin, Brampton
On October 7, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Al Abdulmohsin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by inappropriately submitting OHIP clinical billings for payment for services he provided during his residency education program for personal gain, despite this not being permitted under the agreement between the Saudi Bureau and Revenue Canada and against the express advice of his Divisional Chief and Program Director. The Committee further found that he engaged in unprofessional conduct by touching two nurses in an intimate and intrusive manner.

A penalty hearing is yet to be scheduled.

A summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Al Abdulmohsin’s profile.

Dr. Israel Shoel Rosenhek, Toronto
On October 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Rosenhek committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in unprofessional conduct by practising medicine without clinical supervision, in breach of a 2010 Order of the Discipline Committee, and contrary to the terms, conditions, and limitations on his certificate of registration.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Rosenhek’s profile.

Dr. Wycliffe Hobart Baird, Mississauga
On October 16, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baird committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

On October 16, 2017, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty.

A detailed summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Baird’s profile.