News Release

2017 - 10 - 4 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman; Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans; Dr. Rasiklal Narshidas Morzaria

Oct 04, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Mory Mayer Gutman, Toronto
On August 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gutman committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee reserved its decision regarding the penalty.

A summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct is available on the public register at Dr. Gutman's profile.

Dr. Rob Joseph Kamermans (no practice address) formerly Coe Hill
On July 25, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kamermans committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. The Committee reserved its decision regarding penalty.

On September 25, 2017, the Discipline Committee released the decision on penalty. A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty ordered is available on the public register at Dr. Kamerman’s profile.

Dr. Rasiklal Narshidas Morzaria, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On September 11, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Morzaria committed acts of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the decision on the findings of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Morzaria’s profile.