News Release

2017 - 8 - 30 Discipline Committee Decisions

Dr. Roger Cyril Wales; Dr. Allyson Enid Koffman; Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad Ghabbour

Aug 30, 2017

The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) is the licensing and disciplinary body for physicians in Ontario. Discipline hearings are held to decide allegations of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and are open to the public. The College is releasing brief summaries of recent discipline hearing results. A detailed decision and reasons for the decision is posted on the College’s website as it becomes available. To access more information, enter the doctor’s name in the Public Register – All Doctors Search section of the College’s website at www.cpso.on.ca and click on “view details”, or use the link to each doctor’s profile, provided below.

Dr. Roger Cyril Wales, (no practice address) formerly Napanee
On January 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wales committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Wales is incompetent.

On August 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee granted an adjournment of the penalty hearing of September 9, 2015 provided that Dr. Wales will not engage in the practice of medicine pending the completion of the penalty hearing.

A contested penalty hearing proceeded on April 24, 2017. A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct, and the penalty ordered on August 3, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Wales' profile.

Dr. Allyson Enid Koffman, Toronto
On August 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Koffman committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct and the penalty is available on the public register at Dr. Koffman’s profile.

Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad Ghabbour, (no practice address) formerly Toronto
On February 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ghabbour committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

A detailed summary of the decision on the finding of professional misconduct, and the penalty ordered on August 21, 2017, is available on the public register at Dr. Ghabbour’s profile.